US SB1634 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the designation of certain wilderness areas, recreation management areas, and conservation areas in the State of Colorado, and for other purposes.
Title
Colorado Outdoor Recreation and Economy Act
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3437 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/1634/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s1634/BILLS-118s1634is.pdf |