US SB163 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child Protection Improvements Act of 2009 - Amends the National Child Protection Act of 1993 to direct the Attorney General to establish a program for national criminal history background checks for child-serving organizations. Amends the PROTECT Act to terminate the Child Safety Pilot Program on the date the program established under this Act is operating and able to enroll any organization using that Program.Requires the Attorney General to: (1) establish an applicant processing center to streamline the process of obtaining nationwide background checks; (2) enter into an agreement with the National Center for Missing and Exploited Children (NCMEC) to establish a criminal history resource center to provide child-serving organizations with reliable and accurate information for interpreting criminal histories; and (3) assess annually the compliance of state criminal background check programs with requirements of this Act.Sets forth the duties of applicant processing centers, procedures for requesting a nationwide criminal background check, and fee schedules for background checks. Grants individuals who are the subject of a background check the right to request full criminal history reports and to challenge the accuracy and completeness of such reports.Grants limited immunity to child-serving organizations and NCMEC for acts and omissions in obtaining or using criminal history background information. Prohibits unauthorized disclosure or use of criminal history records.
Title
Child Protection Improvements Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Evan Bayh [D-IN] | Sen. John Ensign [R-NV] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
Sen. Arlen Specter [D-PA] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-07 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1469 (Related) 2010-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1365 (Related) 2009-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1598 (Related) 2009-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1365 (Related) 2009-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1598 (Related) 2009-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Personnel records
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Personnel records
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/163/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s163/BILLS-111s163is.pdf |