US SB162 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 121.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 121.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Smith River National Recreation Area Act to include certain additions to the Smith River National Recreation Area, to amend the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate certain wild rivers in the State of Oregon, and for other purposes.
Title
Smith River National Recreation Area Expansion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 121. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 118-49. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6595 (Related) 2023-12-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.