US SB1588 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mental Health in Schools Act of 2015 Amends the Public Health Service Act to revise a community children and violence program to assist local communities and schools in applying a public health approach to mental health services, including by: (1) revising eligibility requirements for a grant, contract, or cooperative agreement; and (2) providing for comprehensive school mental health programs that are culturally and linguistically appropriate, trauma-informed, and age appropriate. Requires a comprehensive school mental health program funded under this Act to assist children in dealing with trauma and violence. Makes only a partnership between a local educational agency and at least one community program or agency that is involved in mental health eligible for funding. Requires the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration to develop a fiscally appropriate process for evaluating grant program activities, including the development of: (1) guidelines for the submission of program data by recipients; and (2) outcome measures to be applied by recipients in evaluating programs, including student and family measures and local educational measures.
Title
Mental Health in Schools Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1211 (Related) 2015-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1738 (Related) 2015-07-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4435 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
SB1738 (Related) 2015-07-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4435 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Subjects
Child health
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Mental health
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Violent crime
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Mental health
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/1588/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s1588/BILLS-114s1588is.pdf |