US SB1580 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Girls' Access to Education in Vulnerable Settings Act This bill urges the consideration of the educational needs of vulnerable women and girls in designing, implementing, and evaluating U.S. foreign assistance policies and programs. The Department of State and the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) may advance programs that: provide safe, primary and secondary education for displaced children; build the capacity of institutions in countries hosting displaced people to prevent displaced children from facing educational discrimination; and help increase the access of displaced children, especially girls, to educational, economic, and entrepreneurial opportunities. The State Department and USAID may: coordinate with multilateral organizations to work with foreign governments to collect relevant data, disaggregated by age and gender, on the ability of displaced people to access education and participate in economic activity; and work with domestic and foreign private sector and civil society organizations to promote safe, primary and secondary education for displaced children.
Title
Protecting Girls' Access to Education in Vulnerable Settings Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 490 (Y: 362 N: 5 NV: 65 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 362 - 5 (Roll no. 490). (text: CR H10547-10548) |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10575-10576) |
2018-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1580. |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10547-10550) |
2018-12-21 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-13 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-13 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-13 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7524; text: CR S7524) |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 530. |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2408 (Related) 2017-10-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Child safety and welfare
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crimes against women
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Human trafficking
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Marriage and family status
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's education
Child safety and welfare
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crimes against women
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Human trafficking
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Marriage and family status
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's education