US SB1570 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Bottles and Breastfeeding Equipment Screening Act to require hygienic handling of breast milk and baby formula by security screening personnel of the Transportation Security Administration and personnel of private security companies providing security screening, and for other purposes.
Title
Bottles and Breastfeeding Equipment Screening Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-09-27 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-09-26 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-09-25 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6465; text: CR S6465) |
2024-08-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 474. |
2024-08-01 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell without amendment. Without written report. |
2024-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3386 (Same As) 2024-09-25 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.