US SB1538 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 618.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 618.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Smith River National Recreation Area Act to include certain additions to the Smith River National Recreation Area, to amend the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate certain wild rivers in the State of Oregon, and for other purposes.
Title
Smith River National Recreation Area Expansion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 618. |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 117-241. Minority views filed. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7329 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.