US SB1538 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-436.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-436.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Employee Ownership Promotion Enhancement Act of 2018 This bill amends the Small Business Act to require the Service Corps of Retired Executives (SCORE) to appoint a SCORE Employee Ownership Director, whose duties shall relate to the various forms of employee ownership. The director shall be responsible for: administering and disbursing materials that contain general information and technical assistance for the establishment of employee ownership structures; coordinating efforts for employee ownership with SCORE chapters located throughout the United States; providing technical assistance relating to a range of business forms and strategies that promote or facilitate employee ownership, including an employee stock ownership plan, a cooperative, and any other approach determined appropriate by the director; and providing the Small Business Administration and the Office of Entrepreneurial Development with statistics, including regional statistics from a SCORE chapter relating to services provided to small businesses potentially undertaking a form of employee ownership. The director may be a SCORE employee on the date of appointment.
Title
Small Business Employee Ownership Promotion Enhancement Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Senate | By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-436. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 348. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Subjects
Business education
Commerce
Corporate finance and management
Employee benefits and pensions
Securities
Small business
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commerce
Corporate finance and management
Employee benefits and pensions
Securities
Small business
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations