US SB1530 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Child Nutrition Act of 1966 and the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act to make breakfasts and lunches free for all children, and for other purposes.
Title
Universal School Meals Program Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3115 (Same As) 2021-07-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
HB7585 (Related) 2022-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7585 (Related) 2022-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1530/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1530/BILLS-117s1530is.pdf |