US SB153 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Became Public Law No: 116-115. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Became Public Law No: 116-115. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the participation of veterans in STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics) fields, including by making veterans eligible for certain National Science Foundation (NSF) programs. (Sec. 3) The bill directs the NSF to (1) encourage veterans to study and pursue careers in STEM and computer science in coordination with other federal agencies that serve veterans, and (2) submit a plan to Congress for enhancing veterans outreach. The National Science Board shall provide in its annual report on the state of science and engineering in the United States relevant data on veterans in science and engineering careers or education programs. The bill provides for veterans' participation in (1) the Robert Noyce Teacher Scholarship program to recruit and train mathematics and science teachers, (2) NSF fellowships and masters fellowships for mathematics and science teachers, (3) computer and network security capacity building grants, and (4) traineeship grants leading to a doctorate degree in computer and network security research. The Office of Science and Technology Policy shall establish an interagency working group to improve veteran and military spouse equity and representation in STEM fields. (Sec. 4) The Government Accountability Office must study (1) the academic success rates of student veterans pursuing an undergraduate degree in STEM, computer science, medicine, or other fields identified as meeting national needs; and (2) the barriers faced by such students in pursuing such degrees.
Title
Supporting Veterans in STEM Careers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-115. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-01-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H550-551) |
2020-01-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 153. |
2020-01-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H550-554) |
2020-01-27 | House | Mr. McAdams moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7164-7165) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 314. |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-164. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB425 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation