US HB425 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the participation of veterans in STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics) fields, including by making veterans eligible for certain National Science Foundation (NSF) programs. (Sec. 3) The bill directs the NSF to (1) encourage veterans to study and pursue careers in STEM and computer science in coordination with other federal agencies that serve veterans, and (2) submit a plan to Congress for enhancing veterans outreach. The National Science Board shall provide in its annual report on the state of science and engineering in the United States relevant data on veterans in science and engineering careers or education programs. The bill provides for veterans' participation and outreach in (1) the Robert Noyce Teacher Scholarship program to recruit and train mathematics and science teachers, (2) NSF fellowships and masters fellowships for mathematics and science teachers, (3) computer and network security capacity building grants, and (4) traineeship grants leading to a doctorate degree in computer and network security research. The Office of Science and Technology Policy shall establish an interagency working group to coordinate federal programs and policies for transitioning and training veterans and military spouses for STEM careers.
Title
Supporting Veterans in STEM Careers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] |
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-02-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-02-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2058-2059) |
2019-02-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 425. |
2019-02-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2058-2060) |
2019-02-25 | House | Mr. Lipinski moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB153 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - Became Public Law No: 116-115. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation