US SB1521 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 159.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 159.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to specify that National Urban Search and Rescue Response System task forces may include federal employees.
Title
A bill to amend section 327 of the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to clarify that National Urban Search and Rescue Response System task forces may include Federal employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 159. |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-60. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB639 (Same As) 2019-08-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-48. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Emergency management
Employee hiring
Federal officials
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Employee hiring
Federal officials
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management