US HB639 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on August 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 327 of the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to clarify that National Urban Search and Rescue Response System task forces may include Federal employees. This bill amends the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to specify that National Urban Search and Rescue Response System task forces may include federal employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend section 327 of the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to clarify that National Urban Search and Rescue Response System task forces may include Federal employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13SenatePresented to President.
2019-07-31SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-07-31SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2019-07-31SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5216)
2019-04-09SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-04-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3111)
2019-04-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 639.
2019-04-08HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3111-3112)
2019-04-08HouseMrs. Craig moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-04-02HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 14.
2019-04-02HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-29.
2019-02-27HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-02-27HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-01-17HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1521 (Same As) 2019-07-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 159.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback