US SB1503 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Civilian Property Realignment Act or CPRA - Establishes the Civilian Property Realignment Commission, to be headed by an Executive Director, to: (1) identify opportunities to reduce significantly the federal government's inventory and cost of federal civilian real property, (2) identify not less than five federal properties with a total fair market value of not less than $500 million to be sold, (3) perform an independent analysis of such inventory, (4) transmit to the President its findings and recommendations for consolidating or otherwise reducing such inventory, and (5) establish and maintain a website for making relevant information about federal civilian real property publicly available. Exempts from the application of this Act certain military installations, properties necessary for national security, properties reserved for national forest or national park purposes, Indian and Native Eskimo property held in trust, properties operated and maintained by the Tennesseee Valley Authority (TVA), and postal properties. Requires federal agencies to submit to the Administrator of General Services (GSA) and the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) on an annual basis: (1) current data of all federal civilian real properties, and (2) recommendations for the sale or other disposition of those properties and for operational efficiencies. Requires the Administrator to develop standards and criteria for such sale or disposal. Provides for a review of the Commission's recommendations by the President and Congress. Establishes procedures for the approval or disapproval of, and for implementation of, such recommendations. Exempts properties included in the recommendations for disposal or realignment under this Act from certain public benefit conveyance requirements, including the McKinney-Vento Act (requiring surplus property to be used to assist the homeless). Limits the authority of executive agencies to lease space for the purposes of a public building. Requires the Commission to identify and create, on an annual basis, a list of assets located outside of the United States and its territories that are owned or managed by the Bureau of Overseas Building Operations of the Department of State that may be sold to reduce civilian real property inventory or be otherwise disposed of, transferred, or consolidated. Requires OMB and GSA to provide specified congressional committees, upon request, access to the Federal Real Property Profile established by Executive Order 13327, dated February 4, 2004, and make all information in such Profile available to the committees. Requires OMB to make such Profile available to the Government Accountability Office (GAO) upon the request of the Comptroller General. Requires each federal agency, not later than three years after the enactment of this Act, to sell, dispose, transfer, exchange, consolidate, co-locate, reconfigure, or redevelop any property that is deemed excess property.
Title
Civilian Property Realignment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Brown [R-MA] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1734 (Related) 2012-02-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2232 (Related) 2012-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2232 (Related) 2012-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Land transfers
Legislative rules and procedure
Public contracts and procurement
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Land transfers
Legislative rules and procedure
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/1503/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s1503/BILLS-112s1503is.pdf |