US SB1487 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ANCSA Kaktovik and Canyon Village Land Conveyance Settlement Act of 2017 This bill requires the Department of the Interior to convey: (1) specified surface estate to the Kaktovik Inupiat Corporation, an Alaska Native village corporation, in accordance with an agreement effective January 22, 1993; and (2) specified subsurface estate to the Arctic Slope Regional Corporation, the Alaska Native regional corporation for the village of Kaktovik, pursuant to an agreement dated August 9, 1983. Interior also must convey: (1) up to 6,400 acres of surface estate to Kian Tr'ee Corporation, a village corporation, for the village of Canyon Village; and (2) equal acreage of subsurface estate to Doyon Limited, the regional corporation for Canyon Village.
Title
ANCSA Kaktovik and Canyon Village Land Conveyance Settlement Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1481 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1487/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1487/BILLS-115s1487is.pdf |