US SB1446 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation program. This bill amends the Omnibus Parks and Public Lands Management Act of 1996 to reauthorize for FY2018-FY2024 the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation Fund Grant Program.
Title
A bill to reauthorize the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-234. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1135 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 391.
Subjects
Educational facilities and institutions
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Minority education
Public lands and natural resources
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Minority education
Public lands and natural resources