US HB1135 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 391.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 391.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation program. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Omnibus Parks and Public Lands Management Act of 1996 to reauthorize for FY2018-FY2024 the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation Fund Grant Program.
Title
To reauthorize the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 391. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-236. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-06-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5207) |
2017-06-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1135. |
2017-06-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5207-5210) |
2017-06-27 | House | Mr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-06-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 104. |
2017-06-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-157. |
2017-04-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1446 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389.
Subjects
Educational facilities and institutions
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Minority education
Public lands and natural resources
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Minority education
Public lands and natural resources