US SB1436 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nevada Native Nations Land Act (Sec. 3) This bill requires the United States to hold in trust the following lands for the benefit of: the Fort McDermitt Paiute and Shoshone Tribe of the Fort McDermitt Indian Reservation, 19,094 acres of Bureau of Land Management (BLM) land; the Shoshone-Paiute Tribes of the Duck Valley Indian Reservation, 82 acres of Forest Service land; the Summit Lake Paiute Tribe, 941 acres of BLM land; the Reno-Sparks Indian Colony, 13,434 acres of BLM land; the Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, 6,357 acres of BLM land; and the Duckwater Shoshone Tribe 31,269 acres of BLM land. The lands held for these tribes shall be part of their respective reservations. (Sec. 4) Gaming is prohibited on these lands.
Title
Nevada Native Nations Land Act
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2016-04-15 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-04-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2105-2106; text of committee substitute as amended: CR S2106) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 377. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-216. |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3242-3243) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2733 (Same As) 2016-10-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-232. (TXT | PDF)