US SB1399 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 285.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 285.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and reauthorizes through FY2024 grant programs that fund nursing workforce development and retention. Such grants must generally be used to develop high-quality nursing services in areas that have, or are projected to have, a nursing shortage. The bill also reauthorizes grant programs for nursing education, loan repayment, and geriatric care training.The bill further requires the Government Accountability Office to evaluate and report on the nursing education loan repayment program, including (1) the methods of payment, (2) existing and recommended oversight functions, (3) the number of nurses participating in the program, and (4) the type of facility at which participants are serving.
Title
Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 285. |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Mental health
Nursing
Student aid and college costs
Education programs funding
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Mental health
Nursing
Student aid and college costs