US SB1396 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to establish State and Indian Tribe grants for community colleges and grants for Historically Black Colleges and Universities, Tribal Colleges and Universities, and Minority-Serving Institutions, and for other purposes.
Title
America’s College Promise Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2861 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB1198 (Related) 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-205.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1198 (Related) 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-205.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1396/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1396/BILLS-117s1396is.pdf |