US SB1379 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Became Public Law No: 116-22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-22.
2019-06-24HouseSigned by President.
2019-06-13HousePresented to President.
2019-06-04HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-04HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4245-4262)
2019-06-04HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1379.
2019-06-04HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4245-4265)
2019-06-04HouseMs. Eshoo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-05-20HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-05-20HouseReceived in the House.
2019-05-20SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-05-16SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2930-2946)
2019-05-16SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2929-2946)
2019-05-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

HB269 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 10.
SB11 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects

Advisory bodies
Aging
Blood and blood diseases
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Chemical and biological weapons
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Federal-Indian relations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical education
Medical research
Military education and training
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military readiness
Natural disasters
Public participation and lobbying
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Terrorism

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback