US SB1342 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-274.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-274.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to update at least once every seven years its environmental sensitivity index products for each coastal area of the Great Lakes. An environmental sensitivity index product is a map or similar tool that is utilized to identify sensitive shoreline resources prior to an oil spill event.
Title
Great Lakes Environmental Sensitivity Index Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-274. |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1342 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7397) |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2020-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6108-6109) |
2020-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1342. |
2020-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6108-6110) |
2020-12-03 | House | Mr. Case moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6712-6713; text: CR S6712-6713) |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 320. |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment. With written report No. 116-170. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2551 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Accidents
Aquatic ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Great Lakes
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
Aquatic ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Great Lakes
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores