US SB1335 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 388.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 388.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ste. Genevieve National Historical Park Establishment Act This bill establishes the Ste. Genevieve National Historical Park in Missouri as a unit of the National Park System. The Department of the Interior may acquire, by donation, purchase, or exchange, any land or interest in land located within the park's boundary or any nationally significant property identified in the special resource study that is within the Ste. Genevieve Historic District National Historic Landmark.
Title
Ste. Genevieve National Historical Park Establishment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 388. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-233. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2888 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 392.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Missouri
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Land transfers
Missouri
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources