US HB2888 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 392.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 392.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ste. Genevieve National Historical Park Establishment Act This bill establishes the Ste. Genevieve National Historical Park in Missouri as a unit of the National Park System. The Department of the Interior may acquire by donation, purchase, or exchange any land or interest in land located within the park's boundary or any nationally significant property identified in the special resource study that is within the Ste. Genevieve Historic District National Historic Landmark.
Title
Ste. Genevieve National Historical Park Establishment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 392. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-237. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H750-751) |
2018-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2888. |
2018-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H750-752) |
2018-02-05 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-02-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 405. |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-540. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-11-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-06-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1335 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 388.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Missouri
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Land transfers
Missouri
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources