US SB1335 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-22)
Status: Passed on August 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-03 - Became Public Law No: 112-153.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-22)
Status: Passed on August 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-03 - Became Public Law No: 112-153.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pilot's Bill of Rights - Requires National Transportation Safety Board (NTSB) proceedings for the review of decisions of the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to deny, amend, modify, suspend, or revoke an airman's certificate to be conducted, to the extent practicable, in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Federal Rules of Evidence. Requires the Administrator to: (1) provide timely, written notification to the subject of an investigation involving the approval, denial, suspension, modification, or revocation of an airman certificate of specified information pertinent to the investigation; and (2) provide him or her with access to relevant air traffic data. Authorizes the Administrator to delay such notification if it threatens the integrity of the investigation. Allows a substantially affected individual to elect to file an appeal of a certificate denial, a punitive civil action, or an emergency order of revocation in the U.S. district court in which individual resides, in which the action in question occurred, or the district court for the District of Columbia. Allows a substantially affected individual who elects not to file an appeal in a U.S. district court to file such appeal in the appropriate U.S. court of appeals. Directs the Administrator to begin a Notice to Airmen (NOTAM) Improvement Program to improve the system of providing airmen with pertinent and timely information before a flight in the national airspace system. Requires the Administrator to establish a NOTAM Improvement Panel composed of representatives of relevant nonprofit and not-for-profit general aviation pilot groups to advise the Administrator in carrying out program goals. Requires the Comptroller General to: (1) assess the FAA process for the medical certification of airmen; and (2) report to Congress on revisions to the medical application form, the alignment of medical qualification policies with present-day qualified medical judgment and practices, and steps that could be taken to promote the public's understanding of the medical requirements determining an airman's medical certificate eligibility.
Title
Pilot's Bill of Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-03 | House | Became Public Law No: 112-153. |
2012-08-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2012-07-26 | House | Presented to President. |
2012-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5100-5101) |
2012-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1335. |
2012-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5100-5102) |
2012-07-23 | House | Mr. Bucshon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2012-06-29 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-06-29 | House | Received in the House. |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-06-29 | Senate | S.AMDT.2489 Amendment SA 2489 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-06-29 | Senate | S.AMDT.2489 Amendment SA 2489 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Hutchison. (consideration: CR S4733-4735; text: CR S4733-4735)In the nature of a substitute. |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4733-4735) |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-07-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2011-07-06 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4400-4401) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3816 (Related) 2012-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
SB3268 (Same As) 2012-06-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 422.
SB3268 (Same As) 2012-06-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 422.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Aviation and airports
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
National Transportation Safety Board (NTSB)
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Advisory bodies
Aviation and airports
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
National Transportation Safety Board (NTSB)
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security