US SB1324 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 348.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of Defense to each create a temporary Civilian Cyber Security Reserve within their agencies to address U.S. cybersecurity needs with respect to national security. Reserve members must be former federal employees or former military personnel, have cybersecurity expertise, and obtain any necessary security clearances, in addition to any other criteria specified by each agency. Membership in the reserves is contingent on a mutual agreement between the agency and the individual. Reserves may consist of different components, with one component obligated to respond to a call to activation and the other not obligated to do so; each agency may establish penalties for those individuals who fail to respond when required. The Government Accountability Office and each agency must evaluate and report on the reserves, including whether they should be made permanent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civilian Cybersecurity Reserve Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 348.
2022-04-27SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-97.
2021-07-14SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2021-04-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2894 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback