US SB1319 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to validate final patent number 27-2005-0081, and for other purposes. Affirms and validates a specified patent and the associated land reconfiguration issued by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) on February 18, 2005, as depicted on the map entitled "Lincoln County Land Patent" and dated December 4, 2014, as having been issued in compliance with the Nevada-Florida Land Exchange Authorization Act of 1988, the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969, and the Federal Land Policy Management Act of 1976 for the benefit and recovery of the desert tortoise, other species, and their habitat. Ratifies: (1) the process used by the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and the BLM in reconfiguring the land as shown in a specified environmental impact statement, and (2) the reconfiguration provided for in a specified Army Corps of Engineers permit. Authorizes the BLM to issue a patent for specified acres of land in Lincoln County, Nevada, depicted on such map and described in the legal description of the proposed lease and fee land on file in the BLM's Ely District Office.
Title
A bill to validate final patent number 27-2005-0081, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2307 (Same As) 2015-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Subjects
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Land transfers
Nevada
Public lands and natural resources
Land transfers
Nevada
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/1319/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s1319/BILLS-114s1319is.pdf |