US SB128 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the assumption of full ownership and control of the International Outfall Interceptor in Nogales, Arizona, by the International Boundary and Water Commission, and for other purposes.
Title
Nogales Wastewater Improvement Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4643 (Same As) 2023-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB5705 (Related) 2023-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB5705 (Related) 2023-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/128/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s128/BILLS-118s128is.pdf |