US SB1251 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to establish a voluntary Greenhouse Gas Technical Assistance Provider and Third-Party Verifier Certification Program to help reduce entry barriers into voluntary environmental credit markets for farmers, ranchers, and private forest landowners. A voluntary environmental credit market is a market through which agriculture and forestry credits may be bought or sold. Entities eligible to participate in the program are (1) providers of technical assistance to farmers, ranchers, or private forest landowners in carrying out sustainable land use management practices that prevent, reduce, or mitigate greenhouse gas emissions, or sequester carbon; or (2) third-party verifiers that conduct the verification of the processes described in the protocols for voluntary environmental credit markets. Among other requirements, USDA must publish (1) a list of protocols and qualifications for eligible entities; (2) information describing how entities may self-certify under the program; (3) information describing how entities may obtain the expertise to meet the protocols and qualifications; and (4) instructions and suggestions to assist farmers, ranchers, and private forest landowners in facilitating the development of agriculture or forestry credits and accessing voluntary environmental credit markets. USDA must also establish an advisory council to make recommendations regarding the list of protocols and qualifications, best practices, and voluntary environmental credit markets. The bill also rescinds certain funds provided in the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 and makes the funds available for the certification program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Growing Climate Solutions Act of 2021 Growing Climate Solutions Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 251 (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Amendment SA 2119 S.Amdt.2119 RC# 250 (Y: 11 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-06-24HouseReceived in the House.
2021-06-24SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-06-24SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 92 - 8. Record Vote Number: 251. (text: CR S4740-4743)
2021-06-24SenateS.Amdt.2119 Amendment SA 2119 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 11 - 89. Record Vote Number: 250.
2021-06-24SenateS.Amdt.2119 Amendment SA 2119 proposed by Senator Lee. (consideration: CR S4736-4739; text:CR S4701-4704) In the nature of a substitute.
2021-06-24SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4736-4740)
2021-06-14SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 74.
2021-06-14SenateCommittee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported by Senator Stabenow without amendment. Without written report.
2021-04-22SenateCommittee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-04-20SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.

Same As/Similar To

HB2820 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback