US SB123 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to protect American small businesses, gig workers, and freelancers by repealing the burdensome American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 transactions reporting threshold, and to rescind certain funding provided to the Internal Revenue Service under section 10301 of Public Law 117-169.
Title
BAD IRS Activities Act Blocking the Adverse and Dramatic Increased Reliance on Surveillance Activities Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 8. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB190 (Related) 2024-12-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 696.
SB26 (Related) 2023-01-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB26 (Related) 2023-01-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/123/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s123/BILLS-118s123pcs.pdf |