US SB1201 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 218.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 218.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to replace its existing fossil energy research and development technology programs with new programs. Under the new programs, DOE must research and develop fossil fuel technology for carbon capture, utilization, storage, or removal. DOE must establish a coal and natural gas technology program to ensure the continued use of domestic coal and natural gas resources through the development of technologies. The technologies must significantly improve the efficiency, effectiveness, costs, and environmental performance of coal and natural gas use. In addition, DOE must establish a research, development, and demonstration carbon storage program and a large-scale carbon sequestration demonstration program. DOE may establish an integrated storage program. DOE must also establish a carbon utilization program to identify and assess novel uses for carbon, carbon capture technologies for industrial systems, and alternative uses for coal. Finally, DOE must establish a program to develop technologies and strategies for removing carbon dioxide from the atmosphere on a large scale. The program must include air capture technology prizes provided under a competition as well as grants for centers that test direct air capture and storage technologies.
Title
EFFECT Act of 2019 Enhancing Fossil Fuel Energy Carbon Technology Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 218. |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-115. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 116-296. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Metals
Oil and gas
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Water quality
Water use and supply
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Metals
Oil and gas
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Water quality
Water use and supply