US SB1192 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans TEST Accessibility Act Veterans To Enhance Studies Through Accessibility Act of 2017 This bill permits veterans to get reimbursed under the Post-9/11 educational assistance program for an approved licensing, certification, or national test at a pro-rated amount based on such test's actual cost. (Current law requires that veterans be charged a whole month of entitlement to pay for any such test.) The bill provides that a national test that evaluates prior learning and knowledge and provides an opportunity for course credit at an institution of higher learning shall be eligible for such reimbursement.
Title
Veterans TEST Accessibility Act Veterans To Enhance Studies Through Accessibility Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1104 (Related) 2017-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB3218 (Related) 2017-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-48. (TXT | PDF)
HB3218 (Related) 2017-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-48. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Higher education
Licensing and registrations
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Higher education
Licensing and registrations
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1192/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1192/BILLS-115s1192is.pdf |