US HB1104 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans TEST Accessibility Act Veterans To Enhance Studies Through Accessibility Act This bill permits veterans to get reimbursed under the Post-9/11 educational assistance program for an approved licensing, certification, or national test at a pro-rated amount based on such test's actual cost. (Current law requires that veterans be charged a whole month of entitlement to pay for any such test.) The bill provides that a national test that evaluates prior learning and knowledge and provides an opportunity for course credit at an institution of higher learning shall be eligible for such reimbursement.
Title
Veterans TEST Accessibility Act Veterans To Enhance Studies Through Accessibility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
Rep. David Trott [R-MI] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1192 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB3218 (Related) 2017-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-48. (TXT | PDF)
HB3218 (Related) 2017-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-48. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Higher education
Licensing and registrations
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Higher education
Licensing and registrations
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1104/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1104/BILLS-115hr1104ih.pdf |