US SB1182 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-426. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-426. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to exempt application of JSA attribution rule in case of existing agreements. (Sec. 1) This bill exempts broadcast television stations from the Federal Communications Commission's (FCC's) amended joint sales agreement (JSA) rules if the stations were parties to a JSA that was in effect on the effective date of the amendment adopted by the FCC on March 31, 2014. Under the FCC's amended rule, a television station that sells more than 15% of the weekly advertising time of another station in the same market is attributed an ownership interest subject to ownership limitations. The bill exempts stations from being considered in violation of such ownership limitations by reason of the amended rule if they were a party to an existing JSA that was in effect on the effective date of the amendment.
Title
A bill to exempt application of JSA attribution rule in case of existing agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-20 | Senate | By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-426. Minority views filed. |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 714. |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. Without written report. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3148 (Same As) 2015-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SB1910 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
SB1910 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Marketing and advertising
Science, technology, communications
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Marketing and advertising
Science, technology, communications