US SB1181 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Good Samaritan Search and Recovery Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to implement a process to provide eligible organizations and individuals expedited access to federal land to conduct good Samaritan search-and-recovery missions, which are searches for one or more missing individuals believed to be deceased at the time that the search is initiated. The bill sets forth procedures for the approval or denial of requests made by eligible organizations or individuals to carry out a good Samaritan search-and-recovery mission. Interior and USDA shall develop search-and-recovery focused partnerships with search-and-recovery organizations to coordinate good Samaritan search-and-recovery missions, and expedite and accelerate mission efforts for missing individuals.
Title
Good Samaritan Search and Recovery Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-225. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3668 (Related) 2017-09-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
First responders and emergency personnel
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Land use and conservation
Life, casualty, property insurance
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Land use and conservation
Life, casualty, property insurance
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats