US SB1158 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to improve access to health care through expanded health savings accounts, and for other purposes.
Title
Health Savings Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2769 (Related) 2023-04-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2959 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5737 (Related) 2023-09-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5607 (Related) 2023-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5546 (Related) 2023-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5690 (Related) 2023-09-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2959 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5737 (Related) 2023-09-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5607 (Related) 2023-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5546 (Related) 2023-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5690 (Related) 2023-09-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/1158/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s1158/BILLS-118s1158is.pdf |