US HB5607 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow both spouses to make catch-up contributions to the same health savings account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contribution Opportunities for United Partners with Limit Expansions in a Single HSA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-20HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2023-09-20HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2959 (Related) 2023-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5687 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 317.
SB1158 (Related) 2023-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback