US SB1149 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 679.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 679.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act to repeal a provision limiting the export of timber harvested from land conveyed to the Kake Tribal Corporation under that Act. This bill amends the Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act to revise provisions regarding timber from land transferred to the Kake Tribal Corporation, an Alaska Native village corporation. The bill repeals prohibitions on: (1) exporting from Alaska unprocessed logs from the land, and (2) the corporation conveying timber from the land to a person for export from Alaska.
Title
A bill to amend the Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act to repeal a provision limiting the export of timber harvested from land conveyed to the Kake Tribal Corporation under that Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 679. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-393. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |