US SB1108 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 313.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 313.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
10 Million Solar Roofs Act of 2011 - Directs the Secretary of Energy (DOE) to: (1) establish a program to provide competitive grants and/or challenge grants to local governments that have adopted best practices for solar permitting for properties located in the United States, (2) provide voluntary certification and recognition for such governments, and (3) implement specified criteria for awarding such grants. Authorizes the use of funds for competitive grants for: (1) training and the development of materials and tools for making the local permitting process for solar energy systems more standardized, efficient, and less expensive; and (2) solar energy system deployment projects or programs to pilot new permitting strategies or processes. Authorizes the use of funds for challenge grants for: (1) solar energy system deployment projects, and (2) programs to pilot new permitting strategies or processes. Requires the Secretary to rescind grant funds provided to any grant recipient that receives funds based on a commitment to adopt best practices for solar permitting but that is unable to implement the steps necessary to adopt such practices. Makes each eligible entity receiving funds responsible for a matching amount not to exceed 50% of the funds provided. Sets goals of: (1) installing distributed solar energy systems on not fewer than 10 million properties located in the United States by December 31, 2020; and (2) achieving cost reductions in the price of solar energy by such date, consistent with DOE's SunShot Initiative. Requires the Secretary to report on: (1) additional recommendations that the Secretary determines to be necessary to achieve such goals, and (2) the progress of grant recipients in implementing and maintaining best practices for solar permitting. Authorizes appropriations for FY2012-FY2016.
Title
10 Million Solar Roofs Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 313. |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with an amendment. With written report No. 112-144. |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2011-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 112-253. |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3664 (Related) 2011-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Energy
Energy research
Licensing and registrations
Research administration and funding
Research and development
State and local government operations
Energy
Energy research
Licensing and registrations
Research administration and funding
Research and development
State and local government operations