US SB1097 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Became Public Law No: 117-149. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a rotational cyber workforce program under which certain federal employees may be detailed among rotational cyber workforce positions at other agencies. authorizes an agency to determine whether a workforce position involving information technology, cybersecurity, or other cyber-related functions in that agency is eligible for the program. Additionally, the bill requires the Office of Personnel Management to issue a Federal Rotational Cyber Workforce Program operation plan providing policies, processes, and procedures for detailing employees among rotational cyber workforce positions at agencies. The Government Accountability Office must assess the operation and effectiveness of the rotational cyber workforce program by addressing the extent to which agencies have participated in the program and the experiences of employees serving in the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Rotational Cyber Workforce Program Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-21SenateBecame Public Law No: 117-149. (TXT | PDF)
2022-06-21SenateSigned by President.
2022-06-09SenatePresented to President.
2022-05-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2022-05-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4759-4760)
2022-05-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1097.
2022-05-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4759-4761)
2022-05-10HouseMr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-12-16HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-12-16HouseReceived in the House.
2021-12-15SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-12-14SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9156-9157; text: CR S9156-9157)
2021-12-06SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 177.
2021-12-06SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-47.
2021-05-12SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-04-13SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB3599 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 343.
HB4521 (Related) 2022-05-05 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback