US SB1088 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 276.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 276.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize the relinquishment and in lieu selection of land and minerals in the State of North Dakota, to restore land and minerals to Indian Tribes within the State of North Dakota, and for other purposes.
Title
North Dakota Trust Lands Completion Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 276. |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-132. |
2023-09-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2405 (Same As) 2023-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.