US SB1079 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Withdraws any federal lands and interests that are within the boundaries of the Chaco Cultural Heritage Withdrawal Area and any land or interest located in such area which is acquired by the United States after enactment of this bill from entry, appropriation, and disposal under the public land laws; location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and operation of the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws. The Department of the Interior may convey the federal lands to, or exchange such lands with, an Indian tribe in accordance with an approved resource management plan. Certain oil and gas leases for federal lands on which drilling options have not started before the end of the primary term of the applicable lease and that are not producing oil or gas in paying quantities must terminate by operation of law pursuant to the Mineral Leasing Act and federal regulations, and may not be extended by Interior. Any portion of federal land subject to such a lease that has been terminated, relinquished, or acquired by the United States shall also be withdrawn as described above.
Title
Chaco Cultural Heritage Area Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2181 (Same As) 2019-10-31 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HR656 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR656 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
New Mexico
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
New Mexico
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1079/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1079/BILLS-116s1079is.pdf |