US SB1069 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Device Safety Monitoring Act This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) to support pilot projects in order to provide timely and reliable information on the safety and effectiveness of marketed medical devices. The projects must: (1) be designed to generate safety and active surveillance data, (2) inform support for safety and active surveillance activities, (3) be coordinated with a system for evaluating medical device technology that operates under a board with representation from consumer groups and device manufacturers, and (4) use electronic health data. The FDA may determine that a manufacturer's participation in a pilot project satisfies requirements regarding reporting or postmarket surveillance if the project captures adverse event information and the FDA has established procedures to publish safety information from the project. Not later than January 31, 2021, the FDA must evaluate real world evidence pilot projects, such as the ones supported by this bill, for their ability to inform decision-making and efficiently generate evidence about the safety or effectiveness of medical devices.
Title
Medical Device Safety Monitoring Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
SB934 (Related) 2017-05-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 76.
HB2430 (Related) 2017-08-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-52. (TXT | PDF)
HB2430 (Related) 2017-08-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-52. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Product safety and quality
Public contracts and procurement
Technology assessment
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Product safety and quality
Public contracts and procurement
Technology assessment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1069/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1069/BILLS-115s1069is.pdf |