US SB1017 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 523.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 523.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cane River National Heritage Area Reauthorization Act of 2010 - Amends the Cane River Creole National Historical Park and National Heritage Area Act to: (1) add to the purposes of the Cane River National Heritage Area (Louisiana) the fostering of compatible economic development and the enhancement of the quality of life for local residents; (2) revise the boundaries of the Cane River National Heritage Area; (3) revise the composition of the membership and powers of the Cane River National Heritage Area Commission; (4) require the Secretary of the Interior to review amendments to the management plan that substantially alter the purposes for the Heritage Area; and (5) extend the termination date of the Commission to September 30, 2015. Directs the Secretary to conduct an evaluation of the accomplishments of the Heritage Area and report to Congress on the results of the evaluation, including any future role of the National Park Service respecting the Area.
Title
Cane River National Heritage Area Reauthorization Act of 2010
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-05 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 523. | |
2010-08-05 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with amendments. With written report No. 111-253. | |
2010-06-21 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. | |
2010-03-17 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 111-476. | |
2009-05-11 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5330-5331) | |
2009-05-11 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5330) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2383 (Same As) 2009-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.