US SB1002 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to prohibit false or misleading advertising for health insurance coverage, require warnings and reporting with respect to noncomprehensive health plans, encourage enrollment in health plans, and for other purposes.
Title
Junk Plan Accountability and Disclosure Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB908 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1796 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1806 (Related) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1872 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1874 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1796 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1806 (Related) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1872 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1874 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1002/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1002/BILLS-117s1002is.pdf |