US HB908 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to provide for Federal Exchange outreach and educational activities.
Title
MORE Health Education Act Marketing and Outreach Restoration to Empower Health Education Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1002 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1872 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1872 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/908/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr908/BILLS-117hr908ih.pdf |