US HR985 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the contributions of Catholic schools in the United States and celebrating the 50th annual "National Catholic Schools Week".
Title
Supporting the contributions of Catholic schools in the United States and celebrating the 50th annual "National Catholic Schools Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] |
Rep. Mike Flood [R-NE] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] |
Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR68 (Related) 2023-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR17 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S128; text: CR S124)
SR539 (Same As) 2024-01-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S322; text: CR S312-313)
SR17 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S128; text: CR S124)
SR539 (Same As) 2024-01-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S322; text: CR S312-313)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/985/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres985/BILLS-118hres985ih.pdf |