US HR981 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
Pending: House Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
Pending: House Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the importance of Tribal colleges and universities to the United States and expressing support for designating the week beginning February 5, 2024, as "National Tribal Colleges and Universities Week".
Title
Recognizing the importance of Tribal colleges and universities to the United States and expressing support for designating the week beginning February 5, 2024, as "National Tribal Colleges and Universities Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR29 (Related) 2023-02-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S240; text: CR S238)
SR544 (Related) 2024-02-06 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S426; text: CR S425)
HR107 (Same As) 2023-02-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
SR544 (Related) 2024-02-06 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S426; text: CR S425)
HR107 (Same As) 2023-02-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/981/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres981/BILLS-118hres981ih.pdf |