US HR974 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week of January 21 through January 27, 2024, as "National School Choice Week".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of January 21 through January 27, 2024, as "National School Choice Week".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR11 (Related) 2023-02-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S192; text: 01/23/2023 CR S57)
SR531 (Related) 2024-01-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR51 (Same As) 2023-01-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR531 (Related) 2024-01-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR51 (Same As) 2023-01-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/974/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres974/BILLS-118hres974ih.pdf |