US HR973 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of Senate amendment to the bill (H.R. 2471) to measure the progress of post-disaster recovery and efforts to address corruption, governance, rule of law, and media freedoms in Haiti; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 75) making further continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6968) to prohibit the importation of energy products of the Russian Federation, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 7007) making emergency supplemental appropriations for coronavirus response and relief for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for other purposes.
Title
Providing for consideration of Senate amendment to the bill (H.R. 2471) to measure the progress of post-disaster recovery and efforts to address corruption, governance, rule of law, and media freedoms in Haiti; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 75) making further continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6968) to prohibit the importation of energy products of the Russian Federation, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 7007) making emergency supplemental appropriations for coronavirus response and relief for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - On ordering the previous question (Y: 219 N: 199 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 218 N: 204 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 218 N: 204 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-09 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 218 - 204 (Roll no. 64). (text: CR H1390-1391) |
2022-03-09 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 199 (Roll no. 63). (consideration: CR H1393) |
2022-03-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 973. |
2022-03-09 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H1390-1394) |
2022-03-09 | House | The rule provides for consideration of the Senate amendment to H.R. 2471. The rule provides for one of hour of general debate each on the Senate amendment to H.R. 2471, H.J. Res. 75, H.R. 6968, and H.R. 7007. The rule provides for division of the question in relation to the Senate amendment to H.R. 2471. |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 68. |
2022-03-09 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-269, by Mr. McGovern. |
2022-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6968 (Related) 2022-04-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-109.
HB7007 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Rule H. Res. 973 passed House.
HR973 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR75 (Related) 2022-03-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-95.
HR972 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 973, H. Res. 972 is laid on the table.
HB7007 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Rule H. Res. 973 passed House.
HR973 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR75 (Related) 2022-03-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-95.
HR972 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 973, H. Res. 972 is laid on the table.